Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 779 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6384 Week
» 17931 Month
» 417613 Year
» 494200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6233   07/1938
BR 46233   10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1938 DUCHESS OF SUTHERLAND

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Coronation (Semi)
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 07/1938
Withdrawal During 02/1964
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5A Crewe North 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 14/06/1958
5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 02/04/1960
5A Crewe North w/e 23/04/1960
1B Camden w/e 30/04/1960
8A Edge Hill w/e 17/09/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 1B Camden 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 24/09/1960
WDN   w/e 08/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Operational
Status Date 30/06/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1938 To Service To service as LMS Number 6233, name: DUCHESS OF SUTHERLAND
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46233    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 46233    

prev prev