Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 219 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 219 Week
» 11766 Month
» 411448 Year
» 488035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Orig) 13000   19/06/1926
LMS (1934) 2700   30/11/1934
BR 42700   18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class Crab
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 84
To Service Sat 19/06/1926
Withdrawal Sat 19/03/1966
Service Life 39 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
25A Wakefield 4w/e 03/12/1955
26D Bury 4w/e 25/02/1956
9G Gorton w/e 24/10/1964
9D Newton Heath w/e 12/06/1965
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn 19/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 05/02/1949
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 19/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/06/1926 To Service To service as LMS Number 13000
Built at Horwich Works
   
30/11/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 2700    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
18/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42700    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
19/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42700    

prev