Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 217 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 217 Week
» 11764 Month
» 411446 Year
» 488033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Orig) 13065   12/08/1927
LMS (1934) 2765   27/07/1934
BR 42765   23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class Crab
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 325
To Service Sat 12/08/1927
Withdrawal Sat 10/12/1966
Service Life 39 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
19E Belle Vue 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 07/10/1950
28B Fleetwood 4w/e 08/09/1951
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 23/05/1964
   Withdrawn 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 19D Heaton Mersey w/e 05/07/1947
EXLOAN 19E Belle Vue w/e 30/08/1947
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 28B Fleetwood w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/08/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 13065
Built at Crewe Works
   
27/07/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 2765    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Belle Vue (19E)    
23/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42765    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42765    

prev prev