Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 775 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6380 Week
» 17927 Month
» 417609 Year
» 494196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Orig) 13159   21/03/1930
LMS (1934) 2859   12/02/1935
BR 42859 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class Crab
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 341
To Service Sat 21/03/1930
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1966
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9B Stockport Edgeley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A Willesden w/e 28/02/1959
2B Nuneaton w/e 31/03/1962
6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/06/1962
   Withdrawn 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/03/1930 To Service To service as LMS Number 13159
Built at Crewe Works
   
12/02/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2859    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42859    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
28/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
31/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42859    

prev prev