Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 4 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1230 Week
» 20875 Month
» 55517 Year
» 1277082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 85   08/05/1935
BR 40085 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/07/1962
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5F Uttoxeter 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D Stoke 3w/e 14/01/1950
8E Brunswick 4w/e 04/11/1950
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 8w/e 14/06/1952
6H Bangor 4w/e 05/11/1955
1A Willesden 4w/e 11/08/1956
6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
84G Kidderminster 4w/e 10/09/1960
84D Leamington 4w/e 03/12/1960
6A Chester (MR) w/e 29/04/1961
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 16/06/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2D Nuneaton w/e 20/08/1949
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 24/09/1949
LOAN 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 05/11/1949
EXLOAN 5D Stoke w/e 24/12/1949
LOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/01/1950
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 8E Brunswick w/e 14/10/1950
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 07/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/05/1935 To Service To service as LMS Number 85
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40085    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
07/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40085    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev