Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 403 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2849 Week
» 14554 Month
» 346043 Year
» 422630 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2500   28/03/1934
BR 42500 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 28/03/1934
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13D Northwich 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1934 To Service To service as LMS Number 2500
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (13D)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42500    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42500    

prev