Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16445 Week
» 69461 Month
» 188988 Year
» 3215841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1057 |
06/04/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
06/04/1963 to Newton Abbot (83A) |
Withdrawn |
02/05/1976 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
13 yrs , 26 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,296,000 miles |
Cut Up |
30/06/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
06/04/1963 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
04/01/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
03/01/1972 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/01/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/01/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
03/01/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1057, name: WESTERN CHIEFTAIN Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
04/01/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/01/1972 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1057 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
30/06/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|