Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 526 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6280 Week
» 34238 Month
» 68880 Year
» 1290445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2528   18/10/1934
BR 42528 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 18/10/1934
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 18/08/1962
Service Life 27 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness w/e 07/07/1951
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/10/1934 To Service To service as LMS Number 2528
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42528    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42528    

prev prev