Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 827 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2942 Week
» 25448 Month
» 328638 Year
» 1550203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2530 on 26/10/1934
British Railways 42530 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 26/10/1934
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 26/10/1934
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
66D Greenock Ladyburn 8w/e 09/09/1951
33A Plaistow 5w/e 16/02/1952
33A Plaistow 4w/e 22/03/1952
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 06/10/1951
LOAN 33A Plaistow w/e 03/02/1952
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   on 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1951 Derby Works During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. SLS/195102
13/01/1951 Derby Works During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. SLS/195102
30/09/1951 3 cylinder tank trials The 3-cyl. 2-6-4T 42530 has been tried out in the Glasgow area, and so far has been successful on its various test trains. Probably more will now come North for the Ayrshire routes. SLS/195111
04/11/1951 3 cylinder 2-6-4T\'s in Scotland Regarding the arrival of 3 cylinder 2-6-4's in West of Scotland, the first to arrive was 42535, still with L.M.S. on tanks which was sent to Ardrossan, though bearing 67A shed plate. It ran on the morning Express from Largs to Glasgow for about 5-6 weeks, until so many protests were made, including letters to the daily papers, that it was taken off, and returned to 67A, 42212 being sent back to 67D. 42535 was unable to do the 42 mile run without an emergency stop for water, which lost time every day. Apart from that, it seemed good enough. We believe it is now at 66D. We have never seen 42530 out of St. Enoch. SLS/195201
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
09/01/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/10/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2530
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
21/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42530    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42530    

prev prev