Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 164 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5918 Week
» 33876 Month
» 68518 Year
» 1290083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2532   07/11/1934
BR 42532 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 07/11/1934
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Tue 12/02/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 26/04/1947
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/11/1934 To Service To service as LMS Number 2532
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42532    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42532    

prev prev