Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 153 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4665 Week
» 27171 Month
» 330361 Year
» 1551926 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2535 on 22/11/1934
British Railways 42535 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 22/11/1934
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 20/04/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 22/11/1934
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 14/07/1951
66D Greenock Ladyburn 8w/e 09/09/1951
33A Plaistow 5w/e 21/06/1952
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region w/e 18/08/1951
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006
04/11/1951 3 cylinder 2-6-4T\'s in Scotland Regarding the arrival of 3 cylinder 2-6-4's in West of Scotland, the first to arrive was 42535, still with L.M.S. on tanks which was sent to Ardrossan, though bearing 67A shed plate. It ran on the morning Express from Largs to Glasgow for about 5-6 weeks, until so many protests were made, including letters to the daily papers, that it was taken off, and returned to 67A, 42212 being sent back to 67D. 42535 was unable to do the 42 mile run without an emergency stop for water, which lost time every day. Apart from that, it seemed good enough. We believe it is now at 66D. We have never seen 42530 out of St. Enoch. SLS/195201
29/12/1951 Empty Glasgow Central With traffic arrangements as they are during the winter of 1951/2 it is possible to have the unusual sight of platforms Nos. 1-9 inclusive at Central station, Glasgow, completely empty at a few minutes past two in the afternoon (Saturdays excepted). The 1.40 p.m. local from Busby is due at 2.3 p.m., and at 2.0 p.m. an outer Cathcart Circle leaves platform 7, while the 12.56 p.m. from Law Junction is just completing station duties at platform 3. At about one minute past two the station pilot leaves with the empty stock, usually passing the Busby train on the Clyde Bridge, and by the time the latter train has drawn to a halt at the buffer stops of platform 10 the engines which had brought the Law train in and the stock forming the two o'clock Circle train have been accepted by Bridge Street box and are on their way to Polmadie, so that passengers alighting from the Busby train can gaze across empty platforms to the stone walls beyond platform 1. Other trains in the station are the 1.42 p.m. from Kirkhill at platform 11, and the 2.10 p.m. for Wemyss Bay at platform 12, the latter usually behind 3-cylinder 2-6-4T 42535. SLS/195203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/11/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2535
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42535    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42535    

prev prev