Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 583 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 583 Week
» 20228 Month
» 54870 Year
» 1276435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2535   22/11/1934
BR 42535 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 22/11/1934
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 20/04/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 14/07/1951
66D Greenock Ladyburn 8w/e 09/09/1951
33A Plaistow 5w/e 21/06/1952
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region w/e 18/08/1951
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/11/1934 To Service To service as LMS Number 2535
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42535    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42535    

prev prev