Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 193 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5947 Week
» 33905 Month
» 68547 Year
» 1290112 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2536   05/12/1934
BR 42536 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 05/12/1934
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping Sat 20/04/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1934 To Service To service as LMS Number 2536
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42536    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42536    

prev