Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 326 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1192 Week
» 25854 Month
» 284713 Year
» 795815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1062 06/05/1963

Names Carried
Name Date From
WESTERN COURIER 06/05/1963

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel 06/05/1963
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front 31/10/1968

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 52
Wheels C-C
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 06/05/1963
Withdrawn 22/08/1974 off Laira (84A)
Time in Service 11 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys
Total Mileage 1,096,000 miles
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 06/05/1963
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/06/1963
87E Landore 6w/e 13/04/1964
84A Laira 5w/e 01/05/1966
87E Landore 9w/e 09/11/1968
84A Laira 9w/e 16/10/1971
   Withdrawn 22/08/1974

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1963 To Service To service as D1062, name: WESTERN COURIER
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel
   
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
09/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
22/08/1974 Withdrawn Condemned as D1062 from Laira (LA)    

prev prev