Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 781 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6386 Week
» 17933 Month
» 417615 Year
» 494202 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5593   12/1934
BR 45593   12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1934 KOLHAPUR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Jubilee
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L885
Works Number 24151
To Service During 12/1934
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Scrapping During 08/1963
Service Life 32 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9A Longsight 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B Preston 4w/e 17/07/1951
12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 06/10/1951
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/09/1960
1A Willesden w/e 04/03/1961
21D Aston w/e 10/06/1961
16F Burton w/e 23/11/1963
9H Patricroft w/e 26/09/1964
9D Newton Heath w/e 02/01/1965
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 24/04/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 16F Burton 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 24/04/1965
WDN   15/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1934 To Service To service as LMS Number 5593, name: KOLHAPUR
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24151
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45593    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
02/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
24/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45593    
26/07/1969 Sightings Allerton shed: Open Day - Exhibited (as 5593) RO 9/1969 Link
26/07/1969 Sightings D1643 hauled steam locomotives 7029 'Clun Castle', 5428 'Eric Treacy' and 5593 'Kolhapur' away from Allerton depot at 18:45 RO 9/1969  

prev prev