Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 218 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 218 Week
» 11765 Month
» 411447 Year
» 488034 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5596   12/01/1935
BR 45596   05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/01/1935 BAHAMAS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Jubilee
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L885
Works Number 24154
To Service Sat 12/01/1935
Withdrawal Sat 23/07/1966
Service Life 31 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5A Crewe North 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 28/07/1962
   Withdrawn 23/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 12/04/1947
LOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 25/10/1947
LOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 23/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/01/1935 To Service To service as LMS Number 5596, name: BAHAMAS
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45596    
28/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
23/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45596    

prev prev