Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1067 |
18/07/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
18/07/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
24/01/1976 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,232,000 miles |
Cut Up |
16/09/1976 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
18/07/1963 |
MFYE |
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
19/10/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
25/02/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/02/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/02/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
25/02/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1067, name: WESTERN DRUID Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
19/10/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/02/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
24/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1067 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
16/09/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|