Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 782 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5383 Week
» 16930 Month
» 416612 Year
» 493199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5690   09/03/1936
BR 45690   05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/03/1936 LEANDER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Jubilee
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 09/03/1936
Withdrawal During 03/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
22A Bristol Barrow Road 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 25/10/1947
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/03/1936 To Service To service as LMS Number 5690, name: LEANDER
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45690    
03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45690    

prev prev