Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 779 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6384 Week
» 17931 Month
» 417613 Year
» 494200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5699   15/04/1936
BR 45699   05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/04/1936 GALATEA

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Jubilee
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 15/04/1936
Withdrawal Sat 21/11/1964
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20A Holbeck (MR) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 07/10/1961
   Withdrawn 21/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 21/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/04/1936 To Service To service as LMS Number 5699, name: GALATEA
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45699    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
21/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45699    

prev prev