Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 61 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 6517 Week
» 23833 Month
» 282692 Year
» 793794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER 2387 y/e c. 0
BR 62387 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Worsdell
Class D20
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gateshead Works
To Service During 04/1907
Withdrawal During 09/1957
Scrapping During 12/1957
Service Life 50 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WHL West Hartlepool 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B Heaton 4w/e 20/06/1953
50C Selby 5w/e 23/07/1955
52D Tweedmouth 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SEL Selby w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC HLB Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC BRI Bridlington w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC ALN   w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 52DALN   4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   02/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 2387    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62387    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62387