Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 427 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2873 Week
» 14578 Month
» 346067 Year
» 422654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER 2469 y/e c. 0
BR 62469 w/e 24/12/1949
(NBR) 256   24/10/1959

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1913 GLEN DOUGLAS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class Glen
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Glen09/1913
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 09/1913
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962
Service Life 49 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 18/04/1953
61C Keith 4w/e 18/02/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1959
61C Keith (Reinstated) 4w/e 24/10/1959
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 27/01/1962
   Withdrawn 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 61C Keith 3w/e 21/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 2469    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62469    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
24/10/1959 Reinstated Reinstated to Keith (61C)    
24/10/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to 256    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 256