Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 15 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6230 Week
» 17935 Month
» 349424 Year
» 426011 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER 2277 y/e c. 0
BR 62277 w/e 13/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1920 GORDON HIGHLANDER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Pickersgill / Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Mon 23/06/1958
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KIT Kittybrewster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 4w/e 14/07/1951
   Withdrawn 23/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 14/07/1951
WDN   23/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 2277    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62277    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
23/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62277