Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18880 Week
» 71896 Month
» 191423 Year
» 3218276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D110 |
25/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45065 |
01/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
25/07/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
05/03/1985 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
Cut Up |
09/08/1988 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/12/1971 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D110 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45065 |
|
|
05/03/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45065 |
|
|
09/08/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|