Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 287 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18090 Week
» 71106 Month
» 190633 Year
» 3217486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1101 |
12/08/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47518 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/08/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
21/06/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1101 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
01/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47518 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
14/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47518 |
|
|
13/10/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|