Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 102 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1339 Week
» 3921 Month
» 268554 Year
» 1490119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 571 m/e 05/1928
BR 40571 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 05/1928
Withdrawal Sat 29/07/1961
Scrapping During 10/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1928
30B Hurlford 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 29/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   29/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/03/1949 St. Rollox MPD On 6/3 the following locomotives, painted black and fully lined, were noted here:-Nos. 40571, 42741/44 an 45167, all ex Works. Also ex Works were:-Nos. 54635, 56268 an 57394, the last two being ex Cowlairs and carrying the shed painted on the buffer beam; both had received intermediate Repairs. No. 54635 was lettered 'British Railways' and still carrying '4P' on the cab. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 571
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40571    
29/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40571    

prev prev