Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1011 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7218 Week
» 4731 Month
» 232615 Year
» 1454180 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 572 m/e 11/1928
BR 40572 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 11/1928
Withdrawal Sat 29/07/1961
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1928
30B Hurlford 01/01/1948
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 09/08/1952
67B Hurlford 4w/e 01/11/1952
   Withdrawn 29/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   29/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 572. 40605, 637. 40906. 41147. 42780. 42832. 43849/99, 44783. 4796, 44878/80. 44967. 45010/16/49. 45115/66167/77/79, 45357/58. 45481/91, 45582, 45713/15/16. 14441. 54462/77, 14499, 54504, 55229, 16157, 16266, 16343, 57307/60, 17366. 17459. 17666. 57686. 17691. SLS/195004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 572
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40572    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
29/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40572    

prev prev