Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 88 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3687 Week
» 9821 Month
» 237705 Year
» 1459270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 605 m/e 11/1928
BR 40605 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 11/1928
Withdrawal Mon 19/10/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1928
28C Carstairs 01/01/1948
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 12/07/1952
67B Hurlford 4w/e 01/11/1952
   Withdrawn 19/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Inverness w/e 03/05/1947
ALLOC 28C Carstairs w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 67B Hurlford w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   19/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Highland Section On the Highland section the last two 'Clans' are at Aviemore, and work the morning goods to Inverness and back, and a local ballast run. Of the small 'Bens,' Aviemore has 14398 for pilot work, Fortrose has 14397 for the Black Isle branch, Forres has 14410 as a 'spare,' Wick keeps three, of which one works the Thurso branch, Helmsdale keeps two (for special and pilot duties), and one or two can usually be found at Inverness on 'spare' duties. As the small 'Bens' are being slowly withdrawn it will be interesting to see what replaces them. Of the 'Lochs,' 14379 is kept spare at Aviemore and 14385 similarly at Forres. The 'Clan' goods 4-6-0's may still be seen doing good work on the Kyle line and sometimes on passenger duties. One is always kept spare at Kyle of Lochalsh and one is sometimes lent to Forres to replace a Midland '2P' on a passenger link. The two remaining 0-4-4T (15051/3) are kept for the Dornoch branch, one at Dornoch and the spare at Helmsdale. The only regular work for H.R. locos. on passenger duties is therefore the Dornoch branch, Fortrose branch, and Thurso branch. The H.R. 0-6-0's are not, of course, working on their home ground, Caledonian 0-6-0's having replaced them. A 'Caley' 0-6-0 works a daily morning goods to Strathpeffer and back from Dingwall. The five Midland '2P' class 4-4-0's 566, 592, 605/19/66 are employed between Aviemore, Forres, Inverness, and Tain, and do not seem to be appreciated! Blair Atholl keeps four Pickersgill C.R. 4-4-0's which return to Perth for coaling purposes. Most H.R. section locos are commendably clean. SLS/194709
28/02/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 572. 40605, 637. 40906. 41147. 42780. 42832. 43849/99, 44783. 4796, 44878/80. 44967. 45010/16/49. 45115/66167/77/79, 45357/58. 45481/91, 45582, 45713/15/16. 14441. 54462/77, 14499, 54504, 55229, 16157, 16266, 16343, 57307/60, 17366. 17459. 17666. 57686. 17691. SLS/195004
30/04/1950 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 40605, 40915, 1148, 2190, 4256, 57353, 57623, 17663. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 605
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carstairs (28C)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40605    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
19/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40605    

prev prev