Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 183 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5937 Week
» 33895 Month
» 68537 Year
» 1290102 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 617 m/e 11/1929
BR 40617 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 11/1929
Withdrawal Thu 05/11/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 30 yrs , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30B Hurlford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 16/03/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 13/04/1957
   Withdrawn 05/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   05/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1929 To Service To service as LMS Number 617
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40617    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
13/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40617    

prev prev