Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 143 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4958 Week
» 11092 Month
» 238976 Year
» 1460541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 620 m/e 11/1929
BR 40620 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 11/1929
Withdrawal Mon 23/10/1961
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1929
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948
67B Hurlford 4w/e 21/04/1951
66A Polmadie 4w/e 01/11/1952
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 11/07/1953
   Withdrawn 23/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   23/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender.
Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed
SLS/194807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 620
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40620    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
23/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40620    

prev prev