Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 143 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 27161 Month
» 330351 Year
» 1551916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 648 m/e 09/1931
British Railways 40648 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1931
Withdrawal Wed 27/09/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 30 yrs , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1931
30D Ayr on 01/01/1948
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 15/05/1954
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 27/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 15/05/1954
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/08/1961
WDN   on 27/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Corkerhill MPD Arrival of further Class 4 tanks were as follows: No. 2276 , Boiler No. 12769 (10/7), No. 2277 , Boiler No. 12770 (19/7). No. 2278 was observed at Manchester as allocated to 26A during W.E. 26/7. No. 648 (30D) the loco. involved in the smash at Elderslie on 20/7 is still lying dead at Corkerhill (4/8). SLS/194709
24/06/1961 Kittybrewster MPD Awaiting scrapping were 40604/18/48/50/3. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1931 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 648
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ayr (30D)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40648    
15/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
27/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40648    

prev prev