Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 502 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6256 Week
» 34214 Month
» 68856 Year
» 1290421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 663 m/e 12/1931
BR 40663 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 12/1931
Withdrawal Wed 27/09/1961
Scrapping During 04/1962
Service Life 29 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30B Hurlford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 15/05/1954
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/08/1961
   Withdrawn 27/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 15/05/1954
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/08/1961
WDN   27/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1931 To Service To service as LMS Number 663
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40663    
15/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40663    
10/03/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.   Link

prev prev