Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 782 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5383 Week
» 16930 Month
» 416612 Year
» 493199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7279   08/1924
BR 47279   09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Service Life 42 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15A Wellingborough 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15D Bedford 4w/e 07/09/1957
15A Wellingborough w/e 03/08/1963
12D Workington w/e 02/11/1963
8L Aintree w/e 04/12/1965
8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 19/11/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 12D Workington 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 3w/e 03/12/1966
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as LMS Number 7279
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47279    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
19/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (8G)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47279    

prev prev