Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 183 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5937 Week
» 33895 Month
» 68537 Year
» 1290102 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7282 m/e 09/1924
BR 47282 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 09/1924
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Scrapping During 06/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
14B Kentish Town 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33A Plaistow 5w/e 24/03/1951
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 17/12/1955
35A New England 5w/e 20/04/1957
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 14/12/1957
30A Stratford 4w/e 08/03/1958
   Withdrawn 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 08/12/1945
LOAN 33A Plaistow m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/03/1958
WDN   04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1924 To Service To service as LMS Number 7282
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47282    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 47282    

prev prev