Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7298   10/1924
BR 47298   08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 42 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2B Bletchley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 11/09/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 04/09/1954
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as LMS Number 7298
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47298    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (10E)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47298    

prev prev