Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 445 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6199 Week
» 34157 Month
» 68799 Year
» 1290364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7300 m/e 12/1924
BR 47300 w/e 23/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 12/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1963
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 4w/e 22/06/1946
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33B Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
35B Grantham 4w/e 25/05/1956
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 20/07/1957
31B March w/e 06/02/1960
24D Lower Darwen w/e 24/12/1960
26F Patricroft w/e 04/02/1961
26A Newton Heath w/e 15/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 28/04/1956
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
REINS 24D Lower Darwen 18/12/1960
LOAN 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 10/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1924 To Service To service as LMS Number 7300
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (13A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 47300    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
04/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 47300    

prev prev