Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 149 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 27167 Month
» 330357 Year
» 1551922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7300 m/e 12/1924
British Railways 47300 w/e 23/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 12/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1963
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1924
13A Plaistow 4w/e 22/06/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
35B Grantham 4w/e 25/05/1956
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 20/07/1957
31B March w/e 06/02/1960
24D Lower Darwen w/e 24/12/1960
26F Patricroft w/e 04/02/1961
26A Newton Heath w/e 15/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 28/04/1956
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
REINS 24D Lower Darwen on 18/12/1960
LOAN 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 10/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1950 Derby Works In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed.
Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal.
SLS/195101
01/02/1960 Peterborough Midland Closure Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. SLS/196003
18/12/1960 Lower Darwen MPD Following the transfer of D3780/1 to Walsall, 'Jinties' 47300/6 (condemned) have been reprieved and re-transferred from the ER to the LMR as from 18th Dec. as replacements. A few days later, 47571/2 were transferred from the NER but have since been re-transferred away. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1924 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7300
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (13A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
23/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 47300    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
04/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
10/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 47300    

prev prev