Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 712 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4348 Week
» 23993 Month
» 58635 Year
» 1280200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7306 m/e 02/1925
BR 47306 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/12/1964
Scrapping During 01/1965
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13B Devons Road (Bow) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33A Plaistow 5w/e 24/03/1951
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 17/12/1955
35A New England 5w/e 20/04/1957
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 24/08/1957
30A Stratford 4w/e 12/04/1958
24D Lower Darwen w/e 24/12/1960
27A Bank Hall w/e 04/02/1961
9G Gorton w/e 09/11/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 33A Plaistow m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/04/1958
REINS 24D Lower Darwen 18/12/1960
LOAN 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   w/e 19/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as LMS Number 7306
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Devons Road (Bow) (13B)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47306    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
24/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
04/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 47306    

prev prev