Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 429 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2875 Week
» 14580 Month
» 346069 Year
» 422656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7327   07/1926
BR 47327   11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 07/1926
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Service Life 40 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1A Willesden 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8E Brunswick 4w/e 02/12/1950
17A Derby w/e 01/10/1960
27A Bank Hall w/e 13/01/1962
8L Aintree w/e 14/12/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 8E Brunswick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 24/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1926 To Service To service as LMS Number 7327
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47327    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
01/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
13/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47327    

prev prev