Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 487 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4123 Week
» 23768 Month
» 58410 Year
» 1279975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7328 m/e 07/1926
BR 47328 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 07/1926
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 13A Plaistow 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1926 To Service To service as LMS Number 7328
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47328    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 47328    

prev prev