Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 196 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4708 Week
» 27214 Month
» 330404 Year
» 1551969 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7351 m/e 07/1926
British Railways 47351 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 07/1926
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1926
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7351
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 47351    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 47351    

prev prev