|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 04/05/1925 | 06/07/1925 | 64 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) |
559200 | |
Swindon Works | 12/08/1925 | 11/10/1925 | 61 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 15/10/1925 | 15/12/1925 | 62 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 22/01/1927 | 06/04/1927 | 75 days | Heavy | 629184 | ||
Swindon Works | 28/10/1927 | 21/11/1928 | 391 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2232 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
726993 | |
Swindon Works | 17/07/1929 | 13/08/1929 | 28 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2404 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/04/1930 | 28/06/1930 | 65 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) |
825624 | |
Swindon Works | 24/08/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 4649 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
901001 | |
Swindon Works | 05/07/1932 | 20/08/1932 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 22/10/1932 | 19/11/1932 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 16/05/1933 | 08/07/1933 | 54 days | Intermediate | |||
Swindon Works | 16/10/1933 | 25/10/1933 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/01/1934 | 23/02/1934 | 46 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/10/1934 | 31/12/1934 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA) |
1069428 | |
Swindon Works | 07/01/1936 | 01/03/1936 | 55 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1158995 | |
Swindon Works | 16/06/1936 | 05/07/1936 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 29/10/1936 | 21/12/1936 | 54 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 13/09/1937 | 07/11/1937 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 4615 (Diagram HA) |
1247085 | |
Swindon Works | 30/11/1937 | 17/12/1937 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 28/01/1939 | 09/04/1939 | 72 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2664 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1321783 | |
Swindon Works | 05/08/1940 | 08/10/1940 | 65 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2560 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1402592 | |
Swindon Works | 08/07/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 75 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2646 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1445114 | |
Swindon Works | 25/09/1942 | 11/11/1942 | 48 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1498782 | |
Swindon Works | 20/07/1943 | 26/09/1943 | 69 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/08/1944 | 15/09/1944 | 42 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1582172 | |
Swindon Works | 30/03/1946 | 08/05/1946 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2616 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1659443 | |
Swindon Works | 16/05/1947 | 27/06/1947 | 43 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/09/1947 | 10/09/1947 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 01/01/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 65 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1736922 | |
Swindon Works | 30/09/1949 | 04/11/1949 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2602 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1814926 | |
Swindon Works | 23/03/1950 | 24/05/1950 | 63 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 21/11/1950 | 27/12/1950 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 07/11/1951 | 11/12/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2756 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1901884 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. | SLS/194606 |
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
31/12/1947 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 111, 823, 1007, 1017, 1760, 2280, 2830, 2873, 2902, 2940, 3810, 3856, 4013, 4036, 4062, 4702, 4705, 4854, 4946, 4947, 5024, 5072, 5073, 5092, 5939, 5966, 6310, 6312, 6329, 6350, 6374, 6397, 6866, 6901, 6921, 6938, 6948, 7001 and W.D. 77429. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 242, 905, 1713, 2781 an 3561. W.D. No. 73291 was ex Works on 11/12, having been fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and a Wakefield lubricator; the Westinghouse brake had been removed. No. 3215 has been fitted with a repaired R.O.D. tender and was ex Works on 12/12. | SLS/194802 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1908 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 111, name: THE GREAT BEAR Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2279 Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) |
||
09/1924 | Naming | Renamed 'VISCOUNT CHURCHILL' | ||
04/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/05/1925. Dep: 06/07/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) |
||
12/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1925. Dep: 11/10/1925. | ||
15/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1925. Dep: 15/12/1925. | ||
22/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/01/1927. Dep: 06/04/1927. | ||
28/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/10/1927. Dep: 21/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2232 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
17/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1929. Dep: 13/08/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 2404 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/04/1930. Dep: 28/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) |
||
24/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4649 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932. | ||
22/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1932. Dep: 19/11/1932. | ||
16/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. | ||
16/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1933. Dep: 25/10/1933. | ||
09/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1934. Dep: 23/02/1934. Work undertaken: Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1934. Dep: 31/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA) |
||
07/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/01/1936. Dep: 01/03/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1936. Dep: 05/07/1936. | ||
29/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1936. Dep: 21/12/1936. | ||
06/03/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2583 | ||
13/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1937. Dep: 07/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4615 (Diagram HA) |
||
30/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1937. Dep: 17/12/1937. | ||
28/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 09/04/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2664 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/08/1940. Dep: 08/10/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2560 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2646 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/09/1942. Dep: 11/11/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1943. Dep: 26/09/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 15/09/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 08/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2616 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 27/06/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
05/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1947. Dep: 10/09/1947. | ||
01/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/01/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/09/1949. Dep: 04/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2602 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1950. Dep: 24/05/1950. | ||
24/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
15/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
21/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1950. Dep: 27/12/1950. | ||
20/04/1951 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2867 | ||
07/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1951. Dep: 11/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2756 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/07/1953 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 111 from Laira (83D) | ||
03/10/1953 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |