Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 371 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7441 Week
» 4549 Month
» 111495 Year
» 1333060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7383 m/e 10/1926
BR 47383 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1967
Service Life 41 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6A Chester (MR) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8C Speke Junction w/e 17/06/1961
12C Carlisle Canal w/e 10/11/1962
24B Rose Grove w/e 22/06/1963
9D Newton Heath w/e 08/01/1966
16G Westhouses (Reinstated) w/e 04/02/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 12C Carlisle Canal 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 17/12/1966
REINS 16G Westhouses w/e 04/02/1967
WDN   w/e 07/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Static Exhibit
Information Cosmetically restored and on display at the Engine House, SVR
Link www.svr.co.uk/
Status Date 19/03/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as LMS Number 7383
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Chester (Midland) (6A)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47383    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
10/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
08/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
04/02/1967 Reinstated Reinstated to Westhouses (16G)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 47383    

prev prev