Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 136 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7877 Week
» 28319 Month
» 365165 Year
» 1586730 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7428 m/e 10/1926
British Railways 47428 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 39 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1926
14B Kentish Town on 01/01/1948
20F Skipton 8w/e 11/07/1953
26B Agecroft w/e 15/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 09/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20F Skipton 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 09/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7428
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47428    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (20F)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
09/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 47428    

prev prev