Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 770 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2885 Week
» 25391 Month
» 328581 Year
» 1550146 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7429 m/e 10/1926
British Railways 47429 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/12/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966
Service Life 39 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1926
14B Kentish Town on 01/01/1948
33A Plaistow 5w/e 24/03/1951
35A New England 5w/e 17/12/1955
35B Grantham 4w/e 25/05/1956
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 20/07/1957
35A New England 4w/e 19/10/1957
16D Annesley w/e 20/12/1958
17A Derby w/e 04/04/1959
   To Horwich Works w/e 25/03/1961
9J Agecroft w/e 09/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 04/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 33A Plaistow m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC HW   4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 9J Agecroft 4w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 04/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002
09/07/1961 Horwich Works (Works Shunters) Paint Shop: uM28360M, uM28673M, 48341. Car Shop: uM28311, uM28387M, uM28584M. Works Yard: 12032, 40075/7, 42721/4, 42941/60/2, 44477, 49637, 52182: Moss Side: D4025, 42747, 42839/71/95, 43045, 43920, 44098, 44141, 44242, 47520, 48084, 48268, 48641. Scrap Yard: 51429 intact. Erecting Shop: D4026/7/95-9, 12003, 42774/8/87, 42829/43/97, 43115/39, 44007/60, 44104, 44339, 44432, 44567/82, 48060, 48155, 48200/9/50, 48329/70, 48464/72, 48501, 48615/98, 48740, Wren. Works Shunters: 11304/24/68, 47402/29. SLS/196108
09/12/1961 Horwich Works Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. SLS/196201
15/04/1962 Horwich Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42789, 48670, LYR 1008, D4127, uM65437, uM77158, uM28580, u28930, u29154, u29241, u29653, u29830 M. Light Repair Shop: 44061, D2388. Test House: 47550, 11305. Yard: 43017, 44334, 47402/29, 48684, 11324/68, uM28331, u29560, u29881 M. Erecting Shop: 42708/32, 42828, 42979, 43960, 44074, 44266, 44364/79, 44468, 44554, 48123/38/61, 48295, 48403, 48715 Wren, 12001/9/19/36/49/63/71, D4128-30 (Engines and body sides), D4131/2 (Engines on frames), D4133/4 (frames only). Outside Erecting Shop: 42896, 42959, 44003, 48257, 48321, D117. Car Shop: uM28221, u28497, u28690, u29022, u29289, u29720/2 M. Scrap Road: NIL. SLS/196205
16/06/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196307
12/07/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196308

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7429
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47429    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
04/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Horwich Works (99H)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (9J)    
04/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 47429    

prev prev