Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 144 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6533 Week
» 26975 Month
» 363821 Year
» 1585386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7430 m/e 10/1926
British Railways 47430 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/01/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1926
1A Willesden on 01/01/1948
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 27/01/1951
10C Patricroft 4w/e 26/01/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 04/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1B Camden 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 10C Patricroft 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   w/e 04/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/03/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7430
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47430    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
04/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 47430    

prev prev