Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 112 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 18373 Month
» 296169 Year
» 1180550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7445 m/e 05/1927
BR 47445 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 05/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/04/1966
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5B Crewe South w/e 16/07/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 02/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5E Alsager w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 30/07/1960
WDN   w/e 02/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 7445
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47445    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47445    

prev prev