Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 500 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6254 Week
» 34212 Month
» 68854 Year
» 1290419 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7458 m/e 11/1926
BR 47458 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder W.G. Bagnall
To Service During 11/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35A New England 5w/e 17/12/1955
35B Grantham 4w/e 25/05/1956
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 20/07/1957
35A New England 5w/e 24/08/1957
16D Annesley w/e 20/12/1958
17B Burton w/e 04/04/1959
26F Patricroft w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 07/09/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   w/e 10/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1926 To Service To service as LMS Number 7458
Built at Bagnall
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47458    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
24/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
04/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 47458    

prev prev