Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 311 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 311 Week
» 30601 Month
» 333791 Year
» 1555356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7512 m/e 05/1928
British Railways 47512 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 05/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/05/1965
Scrapping During 09/1965
Service Life 37 yrs , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1928
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
24D Lower Darwen w/e 07/01/1961
L.M.R.   w/e 28/01/1961
27B Aintree w/e 06/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 08/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 13A Plaistow 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 08/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7512
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47512    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation      
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
08/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 47512    

prev prev