Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 486 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6240 Week
» 34198 Month
» 68840 Year
» 1290405 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7555 m/e 02/1928
BR 47555 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Scrapping During 08/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
18A Toton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33A Plaistow 5w/e 24/03/1951
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as LMS Number 7555
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 47555    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 47555    

prev prev