Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3843 y/e 1917
BR 43843 w/e 13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1917
Withdrawal Sat 21/05/1960
Scrapping Sat 12/11/1960
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
21A Saltley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 04/12/1954
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 18/05/1957
17B Burton 4w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 21/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   w/e 21/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1917 To Service To service as LMS Number 3843
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43843    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
21/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 43843    

prev prev